Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Kerketta, S.V.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Sambalpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1936 Born
25 Oct 196933.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
17 Nov 198650.1AppointedBishop of Sambalpur, India
1 Mar 198750.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sambalpur, India
26 Jul 201376.8RetiredBishop of Sambalpur, India

MicroData Summary for Lucas Kerketta
Bishop Lucas Kerketta S.V.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sambalpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKahupani

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sambalpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast