Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar

Archidioecesis Cuttackensis-Bhubanesvarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Barwa, S.V.D., Archbishop
  • Raphael Cheenath, S.V.D., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 24 January 1974
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 32,440 (12,529 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://cuttackbbsrad.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 9/16 Satya Nagar, Bhubaneswar-751007, Orissa, India
  • Telephone: (0674)250.22.34; 252.05.24
  • Fax: 250.18.17

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Cuttack
18 July 1928ErectedDiocese of Vizagapatam Mission "Sui Iuris" of Cuttack (erected)
Diocese of Cuttack
1 June 1937ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Cuttack Diocese of Cuttack
24 January 1974Territory LostDiocese of Cuttack Diocese of Berhampur (erected)
Archdiocese of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar
24 January 1974ElevatedDiocese of Cuttack Archdiocese of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Cuttack
195012,5004,900,000.3%3212452021426ap1951
196946,8627,620,000.6%324072650557722ap1971
Archdiocese of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar
198024,2777,387,000.3%2963569378419ap1981
199033,2718,780,000.4%3423575833515819ap1991
199949,3919,935,372.5%5030806174116330ap2000
200049,3919,935,372.5%5030806174116330ap2001
200152,0009,935,372.5%5529846194516731ap2002
200258,1969,935,372.6%5933926325916031ap2003
200359,77511,500,000.5%5535906646418231ap2004
200461,37811,500,000.5%5133847305819432ap2005
200662,98511,580,000.5%70451155479118134ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013