Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Austin Anthony Vetter

Bishop of Helena, Montana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1967 Born
29 Jun 199325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
8 Oct 201952.0AppointedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
20 Nov 201952.1Ordained BishopBishop of Helena, Montana, USA

MicroData Summary for Austin Anthony Vetter
Bishop Austin Anthony Vetter (born ) Bishop of Helena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLinton, ND, Diocese of Bismarck, North Dakota
Ordained PriestHoly Spirit, Cathedral, Bismarck, Diocese of Bismarck, North Dakota
Ordained BishopSaint Helena, Cathedral, Helena, Diocese of Helena, Montana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Helena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2019
  • ob/mn/c1: CB, 8 Oct 2019
  • c2+: CB, 28 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 21 Nov 2019

Quantcast