Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Robert Lucien Chapuis, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (renounced the priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1935Born
29 Jun 196227.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
22 Dec 196227.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
9 Apr 196833.0AppointedBishop of Mananjary, Madagascar
23 Jun 196833.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mananjary, Madagascar
29 Dec 197338.7ResignedBishop of Mananjary, Madagascar
8 Mar 200973.9Died

MicroData Summary for Robert Lucien Chapuis
(Layman) Robert Lucien Chapuis M.E.P. (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVescemont, France
Ordained DeaconForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopMananjary, Diocese of Mananjary, Madagascar
Death PlaceCaen, Diocese of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast