Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Joseph Puset, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tamatave, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1911Born
7 Mar 193624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
14 Nov 195746.2AppointedBishop of Tamatave, Madagascar
26 Jan 195846.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tamatave, Madagascar
25 Mar 197260.6ResignedBishop of Tamatave, Madagascar
15 Apr 198371.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tamatave, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Jules-Joseph Puset
Bishop Jules-Joseph Puset S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tamatave

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngers, France

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast