Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Aurelio Torres y Sanz, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cienfuegos, Cuba

Titular Bishop of Augile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1861Born
15 Apr 190442.8AppointedBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
22 May 190442.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
31 May 190442.9InstalledBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
19 Jan 191654.5ResignedBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
19 Jan 191654.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Augile
8 May 192058.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Cienfuegos, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Antonio Aurelio Torres y Sanz
Bishop Antonio Aurelio Torres y Sanz O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cienfuegos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasalblanca

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,918
  • c2+: CB
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,904, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 121, and Page 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast