Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Braulio Or˙e y Vivanco

Deceased

Bishop of Pinar del Rio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1843BornLa Habana
26 May 186623.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
19 May 186724.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
15 Sep 190360.5AppointedBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
28 Oct 190360.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
18 Nov 190360.7InstalledBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
21 Oct 190461.6DiedBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Braulio Or˙e y Vivanco:
Bishop Braulio Or˙e y Vivanco (born , died ) Bishop of Pinar del Rio

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1903, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013