Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Minas

Dioecesis Fodinensis

United

To: Diocese of Maldonado-Punta del Este-Minas



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
25 June 1960ErectedDiocese of Melo Diocese of Minas (erected)
10 January 1966Territory LostDiocese of Minas Diocese of Maldonado-Punta del Este (erected)
2 March 2020UnitedDiocese of Minas
Diocese of Maldonado-Punta del Este
Diocese of Maldonado-Punta del Este-Minas

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966170,000.0%1041408ap1967
197069,85082,17685.0%151164,3657308ap1971
197665,00077,50083.9%162183,6115268ap1977
198075,10087,50085.8%163193,9526369ap1981
199078,90089,50088.2%131145,635162710ap1991
199997,000103,00094.2%18185,38842512ap2000
200098,400104,50094.2%16166,15042312ap2001
2001101,000106,00095.3%16166,31242312ap2002
200257,00071,10080.2%131144,07152310ap2003
200357,00071,10080.2%131144,07152310ap2004
200450,00071,10070.3%131143,571152210ap2005
201374,00077,30095.7%113145,28513510ap2014
201654,50069,98577.9%113143,89213410ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 15 Aug 2020

Quantcast