Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paulin Pomodimo

Archbishop Emeritus of Bangui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1954 BornZiendi
13 Jul 198026.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 199540.9AppointedBishop of Bossangoa, Central African Republic
29 Oct 199541.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bossangoa, Central African Republic
26 Jul 200349.1AppointedArchbishop of Bangui, Central African Republic
26 May 200954.9ResignedArchbishop of Bangui, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Paulin Pomodimo:
Archbishop Paulin Pomodimo (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bangui

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bangui.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,627

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Mar 2014