Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomeo Cattaneo

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate Emeritus to Australia

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1866BornNovi Ligure, Italy
2 Aug 189124.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 191750.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Australia
21 May 191750.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
10 Jun 191750.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
Jan 1933²66.3ResignedApostolic Delegate to Australia
14 May 194376.6DiedApostolic Delegate Emeritus to Australia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Cattaneo:
Archbishop Bartolomeo Cattaneo (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate Emeritus of Australia

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013