Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Marie Raucaz, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands

Titular Bishop of Thelepte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1879Born
7 Jun 190324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
13 Jul 192041.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands
13 Jul 192041.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
27 Dec 192041.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thelepte
22 Jul 193455.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie Raucaz
Bishop Louis-Marie Raucaz S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerrens-Arvey, France

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast