Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry William Cleary

Deceased

Bishop of Auckland, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1859Born
11 Jan 188525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ferns, Ireland
23 Jun 191051.4AppointedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
21 Aug 191051.5Ordained BishopBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
9 Dec 192970.9DiedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Henry William Cleary
Bishop Henry William Cleary (born , died ) Bishop of Auckland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlenranny, Wexford, Ireland

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast