Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Neary

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1946 Born
15 Jun 197125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tuam, Ireland
20 May 199246.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tuam, Ireland
20 May 199246.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Quaestoriana
13 Sep 199246.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Quaestoriana
17 Jan 199548.7AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael Neary
Archbishop Michael Neary (born ) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastlebar

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tuam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,791

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast