Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Walsh

Bishop Emeritus of Killaloe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1935 BornRoscrea
21 Feb 195924.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 199459.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland
8 Aug 199459.6SucceededBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
2 Oct 199459.7Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
18 May 201075.3RetiredBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Walsh:
Bishop William Walsh (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Killaloe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Killaloe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,441

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 17 Nov 2013