Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher Jones

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1936Born
17 Jun 196226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Elphin, Ireland
24 May 199458.2AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
15 Aug 199458.4Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland
14 May 201478.1RetiredBishop of Elphin, Ireland
18 May 201882.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Elphin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Christopher Jones
Bishop Christopher Jones (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoscommon
Ordained BishopImmaculée Conception, Cathedral, Sligo
Death PlaceSligo

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,359
  • r: Bollettino, 14 May 2014
  • d: CB, 18 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 May 2018

Quantcast