Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Cunnane

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1913Born
18 Jun 193925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tuam, Ireland
31 Jan 196955.3AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
17 Mar 196955.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
11 Jul 198773.7RetiredArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
8 Mar 200187.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tuam, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Cunnane
Archbishop Joseph Cunnane (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKnock

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017