Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Patrick Delaney

Deceased

Bishop of Fort Worth, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1934Born
18 Dec 196026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
197136.3IncardinatedPriest of Brownsville, Texas, USA
10 Jul 198146.8AppointedBishop of Fort Worth, Texas, USA
13 Sep 198147.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fort Worth, Texas, USA
12 Jul 200570.8DiedBishop of Fort Worth, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Patrick Delaney
Bishop Joseph Patrick Delaney (born , died ) Bishop of Fort Worth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFall River

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast