Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Licínio Rangel, O.V.S. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of São João Maria Vianney, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Zarna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1936Born
24 Sep 196731.7Ordained PriestPriest of Other
28 Jul 199155.5Ordained BishopBishop
25 Dec 200165.9Converted
18 Jan 200266.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of São João Maria Vianney, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
18 Jan 200266.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zarna
16 Dec 200266.9DiedApostolic Administrator of São João Maria Vianney, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Licínio Rangel
Bishop Licínio Rangel O.V.S. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of São João Maria Vianney

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampos, Diocese of Campos, Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopSão Fidelis, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,458
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,111
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 6 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Oct 2018

Quantcast