Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Bishop Bernard Tissier de Mallerais], S.S.P.X.

Society of St. Pius X

Not in Union with the Holy See

Bishop


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1945 Born
29 Jun 197529.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Saint Pius X (SSPX)
1984¹38.2SelectedSuperior General of Society of Saint Pius X (SSPX)
30 Jun 198842.7Ordained BishopBishop
1996²50.2ResignedSuperior General of Society of Saint Pius X (SSPX)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Tissier de Mallerais (VIAF: 19770534)
Bishop Bernard Tissier de Mallerais S.S.P.X. (born ) Bishop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSallanches, Haute-Savoie, France
Ordained PriestInternational Seminary of Saint Pius X, Écône, Switzerland
Ordained BishopInternational Seminary of Saint Pius X, Écône, Switzerland

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,633

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 6 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Oct 2018

Quantcast