Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Lorenzo

Deceased

Bishop of San Miguel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1929BornRianjo, Spain
24 Sep 195526.3Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
10 Jun 197748.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
10 Jun 197748.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Catula
13 Aug 197748.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catula
26 Nov 198354.5AppointedBishop of San Miguel, Argentina
16 Mar 198454.8InstalledBishop of San Miguel, Argentina
12 Nov 199465.4DiedBishop of San Miguel, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Lorenzo:
Bishop José Manuel Lorenzo (born , died ) Bishop of San Miguel

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Apr 2014