Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger André Marcel Johan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Agen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1902BornMortagne-au-Perche
14 Aug 192725.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 195653.9AppointedBishop of Agen, France
24 Aug 195654.3Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
13 Mar 197673.8RetiredBishop of Agen, France
13 Apr 199390.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Agen, France

MicroData Summary for Roger André Marcel Johan:
Bishop Roger André Marcel Johan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Agen

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015