Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father David Israel De la Torre Altamirano, SS.CC.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Quito, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Bagai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1972 Born
27 Mar 199522.3First VowsMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
27 Apr 199926.4Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
3 Aug 200128.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
18 Oct 201946.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
18 Oct 201946.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagai
7 Dec 201947.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bagai

MicroData Summary for David Israel De la Torre Altamirano
Father David Israel De la Torre Altamirano SS.CC. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito
Ordained PriestSagrados Corazones de San Carlos, Church, Quito, Archdiocese of Quito
Ordained BishopLa Dolorosa, Basilica, Quito, Archdiocese of Quito

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Quito.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2019
  • prof/loc/ob: CB, 18 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 4 Nov 2019

Quantcast