Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe (Joseph) Cardinal Caprio

Deceased

Grand Master Emeritus of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1914BornLapio
17 Dec 193824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Benevento, Italy
20 May 195944.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to China
14 Oct 196146.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apollonia
17 Dec 196147.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Apollonia
24 Dec 196652.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to China
22 Aug 196752.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to India
19 Apr 196954.4AppointedSecretary of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
14 Jun 197762.6AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
28 Apr 197964.5AppointedPro-President of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
30 Jun 197964.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana
30 Jun 197964.6Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jul 197964.6AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
30 Jan 198166.2AppointedPresident of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
15 Nov 198874.0AppointedGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
22 Jan 199075.2RetiredPresident of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
26 Nov 199076.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
Dec 1995³81.0RetiredGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
15 Oct 200590.9DiedGrand Master Emeritus of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe (Joseph) Caprio:
Cardinal Giuseppe (Joseph) Caprio (born , died ) Grand Master Emeritus of Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
  • a cardinal for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2005
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013