Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mahn Erie

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bassein, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1925Born
21 Dec 195126.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bassein, Myanmar
16 Feb 196842.9AppointedBishop of Bassein, Myanmar
12 Jun 196843.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bassein, Myanmar
3 Jun 198257.2ResignedBishop of Bassein, Myanmar
25 Oct 201792.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Bassein, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mahn Erie
Bishop Joseph Mahn Erie (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bassein

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKanazogon
Death PlacePathein, Diocese of Pathein

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 26 Oct 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast