Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno Schettino

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1941BornMarigliano
28 Jun 196423.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 198746.1AppointedBishop of Teggiano-Policastro, Italy
4 Apr 198746.2Ordained BishopBishop of Teggiano-Policastro, Italy
29 Apr 199756.3AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
21 Sep 201271.7DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bruno Schettino:
Archbishop Bruno Schettino (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 21 Sep 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013