Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Donald Alphonsus Campbell

Deceased

Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1894BornBohuntine
3 Apr 192025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
5 Oct 193944.8AppointedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
14 Dec 193945.0Ordained BishopBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
6 Jan 194550.1AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Jul 196368.6DiedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Donald Alphonsus Campbell:
Archbishop Donald Alphonsus Campbell (born , died ) Archbishop of Glasgow

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013