Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrew Thomas (Joseph) McDonald, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1871Born
9 Aug 189625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Jul 192958.4AppointedArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Sep 192958.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
22 May 195079.2DiedArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Andrew Thomas (Joseph) McDonald
Archbishop Andrew Thomas (Joseph) McDonald O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFort William, Lochaber, Inverness-shire, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Benedict, Abbey, Fort Augustus, Inverness-shire, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Death PlaceSt. Bennet's (Archbishop's House), Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 72
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast