Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Andrew Hart

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1904Born
25 May 192924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
27 May 195550.7AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Sep 195551.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
26 Jan 198176.3RetiredBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
18 Oct 199288.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Andrew Hart
Bishop William Andrew Hart (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dunkeld

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDumbarton, Dumbartonshire, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained PriestScots, College, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Death PlaceLittle Sisters of the Poor, Convent, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Balgay, Cemetery, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 81
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast