Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Black

Deceased

Bishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1894Born
27 Jun 192026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Feb 194853.6AppointedBishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain
14 Apr 194853.8Ordained BishopBishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain
29 Mar 196873.7DiedBishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Black
Bishop James Black (born , died ) Bishop of Paisley

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalton, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Mirin, Cathedral, Paisley, Renfrewshire, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Death PlaceBishop's House, Kilmacolm, Inverclyde, Diocese of Paisley, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Conval, Cemetery, Barrhead, Glasgow, Diocese of Paisley, Scotland

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 29
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast