Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Henry Mellon

Deceased

Bishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1877Born
29 Mar 190225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Aug 193558.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Aug 193558.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Daulia
28 Oct 193558.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daulia
24 Dec 194366.9SucceededBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
2 Feb 195275.0DiedBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Henry Mellon
Bishop William Henry Mellon (born , died ) Bishop of Galloway

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdinburgh, Lothian, Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Death PlaceBishop's House, Dumfries, Dumfries-shire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Andrew, Cemetery, Dumfries, Dumfries-shire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 87
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 1 Apr 2018