Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Daniel Martin Spraggon, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1912Born
29 Jun 194533.4Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
7 May 197361.3AppointedPrefect of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)
27 Sep 198573.7DiedPrefect of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)

MicroData Summary for Daniel Martin Spraggon
Father Daniel Martin Spraggon M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Falkland Islands o Malvinas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestGlasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
Death PlacePort Stanley, Prefecture Apostolic of Falkland Islands o Malvinas
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's, Church, Port Stanley, Prefecture Apostolic of Falkland Islands o Malvinas

  • a priest for 40.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 26 Jun 2015
  • c1/loc: CL, 13 Feb 2018
  • b.loc: CL, 23 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast