Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kenneth Grant

Deceased

Bishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1900Born
24 Apr 192727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Dec 194545.7AppointedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
27 Feb 194645.9Ordained BishopBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
7 Sep 195959.4DiedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Kenneth Grant
Bishop Kenneth Grant (born , died ) Bishop of Argyll and The Isles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFort William

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jul 2017