Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Raymond Walsh, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1901Born
7 Mar 192523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
9 Sep 193129.9ProfessedPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
20 Jun 195149.7AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
12 Sep 195149.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Jul 196361.8ResignedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
12 Sep 196361.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
7 Dec 197069.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Birtha
27 Oct 197473.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Francis Raymond Walsh
Bishop Francis Raymond Walsh M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aberdeen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCirencester
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopAberdeen, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Death PlaceGrantham
Buried Place (Original)Grantham, Cemetery, Grantham

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017