Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Donald Scanlan

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1899Born
29 Jun 192930.4Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
27 Apr 194647.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
27 Apr 194647.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyme
20 Jun 194647.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyme
31 May 194950.3SucceededBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
23 May 195556.3AppointedBishop of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
29 Jan 196465.0AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
23 Apr 197475.2RetiredArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Mar 197677.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Donald Scanlan
Archbishop James Donald Scanlan (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Glasgow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParkhead, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained PriestMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Death PlaceTyburn, Convent, Marylebone, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter, Cemetery, Dalberth, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Buried Place (Current)St. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 45
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast