Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert Marie Michel Marcel Herbreteau

Bishop of Agen, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1948 Born
22 Jun 197527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Luçon, France
17 Jan 200556.6AppointedBishop of Agen, France
24 Apr 200556.8Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France

MicroData Summary for Hubert Marie Michel Marcel Herbreteau
Bishop Hubert Marie Michel Marcel Herbreteau (born ) Bishop of Agen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVendrenness

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Agen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,876

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast