Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Luiz Majella Delgado, C.SS.R.

Archbishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1953 Born
2 Feb 197723.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
31 Jul 198026.7Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Aug 198026.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Mar 198127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
16 Dec 200956.1AppointedBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
27 Feb 201056.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
28 May 201460.6AppointedArchbishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Luiz Majella Delgado
Archbishop José Luiz Majella Delgado C.SS.R. (born ) Archbishop of Pouso Alegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJuiz de Fora

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pouso Alegre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,577
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast