Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Araneta Cabantan

Archbishop of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1957 Born
30 Apr 199032.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines
18 Feb 201052.6AppointedBishop of Malaybalay, Philippines
30 Apr 201052.8Ordained BishopBishop of Malaybalay, Philippines
15 May 201052.9InstalledBishop of Malaybalay, Philippines
23 Jun 202063.0AppointedArchbishop of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines
28 Aug 202063.1InstalledArchbishop of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for José Araneta Cabantan
Archbishop José Araneta Cabantan (born ) Archbishop of Cagayan de Oro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagonglong, Archdiocese of Cagayan de Oro
Ordained PriestLagonglong, Archdiocese of Cagayan de Oro
Ordained BishopSan Agustin, Cathedral, Cagayan de Oro, Archdiocese of Cagayan de Oro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cagayan de Oro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,637

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Sep 2021

Quantcast