Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Cosme Damian Racines Almedilla

Bishop-Elect of Butuan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1959 Born
4 Aug 198727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Talibon, Philippines
25 Mar 201959.4AppointedBishop of Butuan, Philippines
25 Jun 201959.7Ordained BishopBishop of Butuan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Cosme Damian Racines Almedilla
Father Cosme Damian Racines Almedilla (born ) Bishop-Elect of Butuan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapayas, San Miguel, Bohol, Diocese of Tagbilaran
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Butuán City, Diocese of Butuan

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Butuan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2019
  • mn: CB, 31 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: CB, 9 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 10 Apr 2019

Quantcast