Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Joseph Adams

Apostolic Nuncio to Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1944 Born
16 May 197025.7Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Aug 199652.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Scala
24 Aug 199652.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bangladesh
23 Oct 199652.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Scala
22 Aug 200257.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Zimbabwe
3 Sep 200763.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines
22 Feb 201166.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Greece
8 Apr 201772.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Edward Joseph Adams (VIAF: 88961155)
Archbishop Edward Joseph Adams (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Great Britain

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, PA

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Great Britain.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,860
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Apr 2017