Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonius Franciskus Subianto Bunyamin, O.S.C.

Bishop of Bandung


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1968 BornBandung
28 Aug 199426.5Solemn ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
26 Jun 199628.4Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
3 Jun 201446.3AppointedBishop of Bandung, Indonesia
25 Aug 201446.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bandung, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Antonius Franciskus Subianto Bunyamin:
Bishop Antonius Franciskus Subianto Bunyamin O.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Bandung

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bandung.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2014
  • ob: CB, 4 Jun 2014
  • c2+: CB, 25 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Oct 2014