Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robertus Rubiyatmoko

Archbishop of Semarang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1963 Born
12 Aug 199228.8Ordained PriestPriest of Semarang, Indonesia
18 Mar 201753.4AppointedArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia
19 May 201753.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Robertus Rubiyatmoko (VIAF: 58411406)
Archbishop Robertus Rubiyatmoko (born ) Archbishop of Semarang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSleman, Archdiocese of Semarang
Ordained BishopLapangan Bhayangkara police academy complex, Semarang, Archdiocese of Semarang

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Semarang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 24 Mar 2017
  • c2+: CB, 7 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 May 2017