Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paskalis Bruno Syukur, O.F.M.

Bishop of Bogor, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1962 Born
22 Jan 198926.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
2 Feb 199128.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Nov 201351.5AppointedBishop of Bogor, Indonesia
22 Feb 201451.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bogor, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Paskalis Bruno Syukur
Bishop Paskalis Bruno Syukur O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Bogor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRanggu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bogor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 4 Dec 2013
  • c23: CB, 20 Feb 2014
  • c4: CB, 21 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,102
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018