Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henricus Pidyarto Gunawan, O. Carm.

Bishop of Malang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1955 Born
18 Jan 198125.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
7 Feb 198226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
28 Jun 201660.9AppointedBishop of Malang, Indonesia
3 Sep 201661.1Ordained BishopBishop of Malang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Henricus Pidyarto Gunawan (VIAF: 88909711)
Bishop Henricus Pidyarto Gunawan O. Carm. (born ) Bishop of Malang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalang
Ordained BishopStade Gajayana, Malang, Diocese of Malang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Malang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 16 Aug 2016
  • c2: CB, 22 Aug 2016
  • c34: CB, 2 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,093

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 3 Oct 2018

Quantcast