Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivo Gugic

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1920Born
13 Aug 194424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
12 Jul 196141.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
12 Jul 196141.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bonusta
13 Aug 196141.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bonusta
196847.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
22 Nov 198363.7AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
11 Mar 199676.0RetiredBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
3 Jun 199676.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Ivo Gugic
Bishop Ivo Gugic (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVela Luka

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast