Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikë Prela

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Skopje-Prizren, Macedonia

Titular Bishop of Rufiniana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1918Born
13 Jul 194123.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 196951.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Skopje-Prizren, Macedonia
2 Oct 196951.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rufiniana
21 Dec 196951.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rufiniana
2 Nov 199577.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Skopje-Prizren, Macedonia
25 Feb 199677.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Skopje-Prizren, Macedonia

MicroData Summary for Nikë Prela
Bishop Nikë Prela (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Skopje-Prizren

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKotor

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast