Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Vitória da Conquista

Archidioecesis Victoriensis de Conquista



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luis Gonzaga Silva Pepeu, O.F.M. Cap., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 January 2002
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Bahia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 25,089 (9,690 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste III
  • Web Site: http://www.diocesevitoriadaconquista.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Praca Tancredo Neves 181, 45045-210 Vitoria da Conquista, BA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (077)2101-5750
  • Fax: 2101-5754

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Vitória da Conquista
27 July 1957ErectedDiocese of Amargosa Diocese of Vitória da Conquista (erected)
7 November 1978Territory LostDiocese of Amargosa
Diocese of Vitória da Conquista
Diocese of Jequié (erected)
Archdiocese of Vitória da Conquista
16 January 2002ElevatedDiocese of Vitória da Conquista Archdiocese of Vitória da Conquista

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Vitória da Conquista
1966705,000750,00094.0%971644,06285614ap1967
1970460,000520,00088.5%1582320,000115915ap1971
1976531,000590,00090.0%1582323,086106818ap1977
1980412,000458,22089.9%16102615,8462125821ap1981
1990474,000594,00079.8%1882618,2302131724ap1991
1999600,000750,00080.0%1792623,0762175524ap2000
2000600,000750,00080.0%1792623,0762175524ap2001
Archdiocese of Vitória da Conquista
2001580,000724,61980.0%32134512,888155325ap2002
2002580,000724,61980.0%42135510,5454173830ap2003
2003592,000725,19281.6%29134214,0955383328ap2004
2004542,249724,61974.8%31124312,6104194528ap2005
2010584,000778,00075.1%3894712,4254194429ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014