Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Zolile T. Brook

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Umtata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1929BornFort Cunningham
8 Dec 195728.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 197949.2AppointedBishop of Umtata, South Africa
5 May 197949.4Ordained BishopBishop of Umtata, South Africa
7 Jan 199565.1ResignedBishop of Umtata, South Africa
5 Sep 201181.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Umtata, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Andrew Zolile T. Brook:
Bishop Andrew Zolile T. Brook (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Umtata

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 7 Sep 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015