Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herbert Nikolaus Lenhof, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Queenstown, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1936Born
25 Apr 196124.6First VowsMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
25 Apr 196427.6Solemn VowsMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
18 Jul 196528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
3 Feb 198447.4AppointedBishop of Queenstown, South Africa
28 Apr 198447.6Ordained BishopBishop of Queenstown, South Africa
16 Nov 200973.2ResignedBishop of Queenstown, South Africa
13 Oct 201781.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Queenstown, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Herbert Nikolaus Lenhof
Bishop Herbert Nikolaus Lenhof S.A.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Queenstown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVölklingen
Death PlaceLimburg, Diocese of Limburg, Germany

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2009
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast