Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denis Eugene Hurley, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Durban


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1915BornCape Town
9 Jul 193923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
12 Dec 194631.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Natal, South Africa
12 Dec 194631.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Turuzi
19 Mar 194731.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turuzi
11 Jan 195135.1AppointedArchbishop of Durban, South Africa
11 Sep 197256.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Umzimkulu, South Africa
22 Dec 198671.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Umzimkulu, South Africa
29 May 199276.5RetiredArchbishop of Durban, South Africa
13 Feb 200488.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Durban, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Denis Eugene Hurley:
Archbishop Denis Eugene Hurley O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Durban

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 56.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1947, Number 13
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015