Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Fanyana John Butelezi, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1930Born
7 Jul 195726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
30 Jul 197242.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
30 Jul 197242.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Proconsulari
22 Oct 197242.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Proconsulari
10 Jul 197544.9AppointedBishop of Umtata, South Africa
27 Apr 197847.7AppointedArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa
10 Jun 199766.8DiedArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Peter Fanyana John Butelezi
Archbishop Peter Fanyana John Butelezi O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bloemfontein

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewcastle

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast